IL SB1191 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0203
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that a person who has received a judgment for dissolution of marriage or declaration of invalidity of marriage and wishes to change his or her name to resume the use of his or her former or maiden name is not required to provide notice by publication of the change of name. Makes conforming changes in the Illinois Marriage and Dissolution of Marriage Act and further provides that if a judgment contains a provision authorizing the person to resume the use of his or her former or maiden name, the person resuming the use of his or her former or maiden name is not required to file a petition for a change of name under the Code of Civil Procedure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CIV PRO-NAME CHANGE-NOTICE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-02SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0203
2019-08-02SenateEffective Date January 1, 2020
2019-08-02SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-19SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-21SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-012-000
2019-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-14HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-003-000
2019-05-01HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2019-05-01HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000
2019-04-24HouseTo Civil Procedure Subcommittee
2019-04-09HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2019-03-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-07HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-07HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-03-07HouseArrived in House
2019-03-07SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 7, 2019
2019-03-06SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2019-03-05SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 007-000-000
2019-02-13SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
735521-103Amended CodeCitation Text
7505413Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback