IL SB1199 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Makes changes concerning the valuation of supportive living facilities to provide that the gross potential income must not exceed the maximum individual Supplemental Security Income (SSI) amount minus a resident's personal allowance, multiplied by the number of apartments authorized by the supportive living facility certification. Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act to make changes to the definitions of gross income, adjusted gross income, and taxable income to include certain Internal Revenue Code provisions related to net operating losses. Amends the Service Use Tax Act and the Service Occupation Tax Act. Extends the 1% rate of tax to food prepared for immediate consumption and transferred incident to a sale of service at a facility subject to the Assisted Living and Shared Housing Act or the Life Care Facilities Act. Amends the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that, beginning January 1, 2020 and through December 31, 2020, sales of tangible personal property made by a marketplace seller over a marketplace for which tax is due but for which use tax has been collected and remitted to the Department of Revenue by a marketplace facilitator are exempt. Provides that the term "marketplace facilitator" does not include any person licensed under the Auction License Act, other than any person who is an Internet auction listing service. Amends the Leveling the Playing Field for Illinois Retail Act. Provides that certified service providers who collect and remit taxes on behalf of retailers may claim the retailers' discount with respect to those taxes. Provides that the retailer is not entitled to the discount with respect to those taxes. Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Modifies provisions concerning data center investment. Provides that a "qualifying Illinois data center" means a new or existing data center that, among other requirements, certifies to the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity that it is carbon neutral or has attained specified certification within 2 years (currently, 90 days) after being placed in service. Amends the Brownfields Redevelopment and Intermodal Promotion Act. Extends the use of the South Suburban Brownfields Redevelopment Fund until 2022 (currently, 2021). Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-VETERANS-DISABILITY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2021-01-13 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2021-01-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-01-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2021-01-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-01-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2021-01-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 008-006-000 |
2021-01-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2021-01-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2021-01-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended |
2021-01-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-01-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended |
2021-01-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2021-01-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended |
2021-01-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2021-01-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Correctional Note Filed as Amended |
2021-01-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Pension Note Filed as Amended |
2021-01-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Judicial Note Filed as Amended |
2021-01-12 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2021-01-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2021-01-08 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-01-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-01-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-01-08 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 008-005-000 |
2021-01-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-01-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2021-01-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
2021-01-02 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-03 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-12-16 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-11-13 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2019-11-13 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-09 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-03-12 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-03-07 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 5, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 008-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-169 | Amended Code | Citation Text |