IL SB1214 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-12 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-12 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the Illinois Education Labor Relations Board for its FY 10 ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective July 1, 2009.
Title
$EDUCATION LABOR RELATIONS BD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 33 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-12 | Session Sine Die | |
2010-06-27 | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-05-06 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-05-06 | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 | |
2009-08-16 | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-30 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-30 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-30 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-30 | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000 | |
2009-05-29 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-05-28 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-28 | First Reading | |
2009-05-28 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan | |
2009-05-28 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-05-28 | Arrived in House | |
2009-05-28 | Third Reading - Passed; 036-022-001 | |
2009-05-19 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2009 | |
2009-05-19 | Second Reading | |
2009-05-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 19, 2009 | |
2009-05-18 | Do Pass Appropriations I; 007-002-001 | |
2009-05-12 | Assigned to Appropriations I | |
2009-02-06 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-06 | First Reading | |
2009-02-06 | Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan | |
2009-02-06 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter |