IL SB1214 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0559
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0559
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Toll Highway Act. Allows the Illinois State Toll Highway Authority to publish the names of toll violators on their website along with the amount of fines and unpaid tolls owed by each violator.
Title
PUBLISHING TOLL VIOLATORS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-31 - House - Motion in House (Y: 62 N: 55 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 35 N: 9 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 35 N: 9 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0559 |
2013-08-27 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-31 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 062-055-000 |
2013-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2013 |
2013-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2013-05-03 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2013-05-03 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2013-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Tollway Oversight Committee; 008-005-000 |
2013-04-24 | House | Assigned to Tollway Oversight Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | First Reading |
2013-04-18 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2013-04-17 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 035-009-000 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 12, 2013 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Silverstein |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2013 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2013 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 016-000-000 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
605 | 10 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |