IL SB1214 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0542
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0542
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall develop and make available training materials that ensure that all phlebotomists are trained in the most current methods of drawing blood from children and adults with intellectual and developmental disabilities. Provides that the materials shall conform to the best available practices used for drawing blood in a safe manner that is as comfortable as possible for the individual from whom blood is drawn and for the families, guardians, caretakers, or companions of the individual accompanying him or her while blood is drawn. Provides that the Department shall review the materials every 3 years to ensure that they conform with the best available practices. Provides that the Department shall ensure that health care providers and laboratories that employ a phlebotomist incorporate the training as part of a phlebotomist's initial employment training and as part of any ongoing training to maintain competencies and certifications as a phlebotomist. Defines "phlebotomist".
Title
IDPH-PHLEBOTOMY-TRAINING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0542 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Public Health; 007-000-000 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Public Health; 007-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Public Health |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Public Health |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 29, 2019 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2019-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2019-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-05-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-05-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2019-05-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-05-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-04-24 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-10 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-04-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-001-000 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; T. Cullerton |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 012-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |