IL SB1223 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides that the Executive Ethics Commission and the Executive Inspector General appointed by the Governor shall have jurisdiction over allegations of sexual harassment made by an elected official of a unit of local government against another elected official of a unit of local government if the unit of local government has not adopted a sexual harassment policy that includes an Inspector General with jurisdiction. Provides that any policy to prohibit sexual harassment adopted by a governmental entity shall be subject to the jurisdiction of the Executive Ethics Commission and the Executive Inspector General appointed by the Governor regarding sexual harassment allegations made by an elected official of a unit of local government against another elected official of a unit of local government if the unit of local government has not adopted a sexual harassment policy that includes an Inspector General with jurisdiction. Provides that the Executive Inspector General appointed by the Governor is not responsible for the training or implementation of sexual harassment policies adopted by units of local government. Provides that "ultimate jurisdictional authority" includes, among other entities, the governing board of units of local government for elected officials of a unit of local government over which the Executive Ethics Commission and the Executive Inspector General appointed by the Governor may have jurisdiction under the Act.
Title
ETHICS-SEXUAL HARASSMENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-04-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Murphy |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Government Accountability and Ethics; 007-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Do Pass Government Accountability and Ethics; 010-000-000 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |