IL SB1232 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Small Business Job Creation Tax Credit Act. Provides that the Act applies for a second set of incentive periods beginning on July 1, 2019 and ending on June 30, 2026. Provides that certain provisions concerning employees who had participated as worker-trainees in the Put Illinois to Work Program during 2010 do not apply to the second set of incentive periods. Provides that the term "basic wage" means not less than $15 per hour (currently, $10). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SMALL BUSINESS CREDIT-RENEW

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2019-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady
2019-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2019-03-28SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-03-22SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
2019-03-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-20SenatePostponed - Revenue
2019-03-20SenateReported Back To Revenue; 003-000-000
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-02-21SenateTo Subcommittee on Tax Exemptions and Credits
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-02-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-02-13SenateAssigned to Revenue
2019-02-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
352510Amended CodeCitation Text
352525Amended CodeCitation Text
352535Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback