IL SB1239 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on August 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0583
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on August 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0583
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act. Provides that any report received by the Department of Children and Family Services alleging the abuse or neglect of a child by a person who is not the child's parent, a member of the child's immediate family, a person responsible for the child's welfare, an individual residing in the same home as the child, or a paramour of the child's parent shall immediately be referred to the appropriate local enforcement agency and State's Attorney for consideration of criminal investigation or other action.
Title
ANCRA-CRIM INVESTIGATIONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-26 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0583 |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Human Services; 007-002-000 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Human Services |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 23, 2019 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-05-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-05-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2019-05-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-03-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-03-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 010-000-000 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
325 | 5 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
325 | 5 | 7.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |