IL SB1240 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Checkout Bag Tax Act. Imposes a tax of $0.07 on each checkout bag used by a customer at a retail establishment in the State. Provides that the term "checkout bag" means a single use plastic, paper, or compostable bag provided by a retail establishment at the checkout, cash register, point of sale, or other point of departure to a customer for the purpose of transporting goods out of the retail establishment. Sets forth certain exceptions. Provides that the proceeds from the tax shall be distributed as follows: (1) the retailer shall retain $0.02 per bag; (2) the wholesaler shall retain $0.02 per bag; and (3) $0.03 per bag shall be deposited into the Checkout Bag Tax Fund. Amends the State Finance Act to create the Checkout Bag Tax Fund. Provides that moneys in the Fund shall be remitted to counties and municipal joint action agencies. Amends the Counties Code and the Illinois Municipal Code to preempt certain actions by counties and municipalities concerning auxiliary containers or checkout bags.
Title
REVENUE-PLASTIC BAGS
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-09-12 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 2, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 2, 2019 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 006-003-000 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 006-003-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 007-000-000 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.891 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1184 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 11-42-17 | New Code | See Bill Text |