IL SB1244 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0317
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Cemetery Oversight Act. Provides that no cemetery authority shall charge a consumer an amount exceeding $500 for the placement of a headstone or memorial marker that is provided for a United States Veteran by the United States Government. Defines "placement". Makes related changes to provide that a cemetery authority claiming a partial exemption under the Act shall be required to comply with this requirement. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VETERAN MEMORIAL MARKERS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-09SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0317
2019-08-09SenateEffective Date August 9, 2019
2019-08-09SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2019
2019-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
2019-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-05-30HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 019-000-000
2019-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2019-05-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-05-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-14HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 015-000-000
2019-04-24HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2019-04-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-04-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-10HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-10HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-04-10HouseArrived in House
2019-04-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2019-04-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Belt
2019-04-04SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Veterans Affairs; 006-000-000
2019-04-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-03-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2019
2019-03-27SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Veterans Affairs
2019-03-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateDo Pass as Amended Veterans Affairs; 007-000-000
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-19SenateWaive Posting Notice
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Veterans Affairs
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-02-20SenatePostponed - Veterans Affairs
2019-02-13SenateAssigned to Veterans Affairs
2019-02-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22541120-13New CodeSee Bill Text
2254115-20Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1244&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1244.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1244eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1244enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0317.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1244sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1244sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1244ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB1244_04102019_011000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100SB1244_05302019_002000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB1244ham001_05302019_022000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback