IL SB1249 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that, upon knowledge of an incident of sexual assault by a student against another student, a school district shall report the incident to the State Board of Education; defines "sexual assault". Provides that the State Board shall post on its website for each school year the total number of reported incidents statewide and in each school district. Provides that the State Board shall also report the data annually to the General Assembly no later than September 1 of each year.
Title
SCH CD-SEXUAL ASSAULT-REPORT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-08 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-04-24 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2019-04-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2019 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 010-000-000 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.69 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 2-3.176 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.61 | New Code | See Bill Text |