IL SB1250 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0205
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0205
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that, notwithstanding any other provision of law, a school district must allow any student with an asthma action plan, an Individual Health Care Action Plan, an Illinois Food Allergy Emergency Action Plan and Treatment Authorization Form, a plan pursuant to Section 504 of the federal Rehabilitation Act of 1973, or a plan pursuant to the federal Individuals with Disabilities Education Act to self-administer any medication required under those plans if the student's parent or guardian provides the school district with (i) written permission for the student's self-administration of medication and (ii) written authorization from the student's physician, physician assistant, or advanced practice registered nurse for the student to self-administer the medication. Requires a parent or guardian to also provide to the school district the prescription label for the medication, which must contain the name of the medication, the prescribed dosage, and the time or times at which or the circumstances under which the medication is to be administered. Provides that each school district must adopt an emergency action plan for a student who self-administers medication; specifies the plan's requirements. Provides that a school district and its employees and agents shall incur no liability, except for willful and wanton conduct, as a result of any injury arising from the self-administration of medication by a student.
Title
SCHOOL CODE-ASTHMA MEDICATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-02 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0205 |
2019-08-02 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-02 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-05-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-04-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-02 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-01 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-03-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Murphy |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 014-000-000 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 21, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 014-000-000 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |