IL SB1256 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0319
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0319
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a person who operates a motor vehicle operating on diesel fuel in an affected area may not cause or allow the motor vehicle, when it is not in motion, to idle for more than a total of 10 minutes within any 60-minute period under any circumstances if the vehicle is within 200 feet of a residential area. Provides that if a person violates the provisions concerning excessive idling within 200 feet of a residential area, the law enforcement agency having jurisdiction over the residential area or the law enforcement agency having jurisdiction over the property on which the violation took place may enforce the provisions.
Title
VEH CD-EXCESSIVE IDLING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 96 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0319 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 096-019-000 |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-04-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Cunningham |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Environment and Conservation; 006-000-000 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 26, 2019 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Environment and Conservation; 008-000-000 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Environment and Conservation |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Environment and Conservation |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Environment and Conservation |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Environment and Conservation |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Postponed - Environment and Conservation |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Environment and Conservation |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-1429 | Amended Code | Citation Text |