IL SB1264 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0546
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0546
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Revised Uniform Unclaimed Property Act. Provides, with exceptions, that the Act does not apply to any annuity, pension, or benefit fund held in a fiduciary capacity by a retirement system, pension fund, or investment board created under any Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that property presumed abandoned in an annuity, pension, or benefit fund shall be reported by the retirement system, pension fund, or investment board to the administrator. Provides that no retirement system, pension fund, or investment board shall pay or deliver any annuity, pension, or benefit fund to the administrator. Provides, with exceptions, that the provisions are retroactive to January 1, 2018. Provides that a retirement system, pension fund, or investment board created under specified Articles of the Illinois Pension Code shall meet or exceed specified minimum standards for due diligence if an annuity, pension, or benefit fund would otherwise be presumed abandoned. Provides that a retirement system, pension fund, or investment board does not need to engage in due diligence if: the property is no longer presumptively abandoned because an apparent owner responds or otherwise indicates interest in the property in response to the due diligence efforts; or the property has a value of less than $50. Provides that the administrator and each retirement system, pension fund, and investment board shall enter into an interagency agreement concerning the implementation of the compliance provisions.
Title
UNCLAIMED PROPERTY-PENSIONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0546 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-001 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Government Accountability and Ethics; 010-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-05-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 28, 2019 |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2019-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-05-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 015-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-10 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-04-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-001 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Do Pass Government Accountability and Ethics; 009-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |