IL SB1265 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0321
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0321
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Universities Article of the Illinois Pension Code. In the definition of "employee", adds a reference to certain persons employed by the Department of Innovation and Technology. Provides that "basic compensation" includes the amount of any elective deferral to a deferred compensation plan established under the Article. In a provision concerning survivor's annuities, removes a reference to a person who has a disability that began prior to the date the child attained age 22 if the child was a full-time student. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-SURS-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0321 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date August 9, 2019 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-02 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 009-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-07 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-03-07 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Government Accountability and Ethics; 010-000-000 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 15-107 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 15-110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 15-145 | Amended Code | Citation Text |