IL SB1273 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0322
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0322
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Park District Code. Provides that real estate, not subject to a covenant to hold and maintain the property for public park or recreational purposes or not otherwise conveyed and replaced as provided in specified provisions, may be conveyed to another unit of local government or school district if the park district board approves the sale to the unit of local government or school district by a four-fifths vote and: (i) the park district is situated wholly within the corporate limits of that unit of local government or school district; or (ii) the real estate is conveyed for a price not less than the appraised value of the real estate as determined by the average of 3 written MAI certified appraisals or by the average of 3 written certified appraisals of State certified or licensed real estate appraisers. Effective immediately.
Title
PARK DIST-TRANSFER OF PROPERTY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0322 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date August 9, 2019 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-20 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-03-07 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 5, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 21, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 008-000-000 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 1205 | 10-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |