IL SB1280 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that a minor found to be guilty for reasons that include a violation of criminal damage to property, criminal damage to government supported property, and institutional vandalism shall be ordered to perform community service for not less than 30 and not more than 120 hours (removes "if community service is available in the jurisdiction"). Provides that the minor's sentence shall not be considered discharged until the cleanup and repair of the damage caused by the minor is complete.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUV CT-REPAIR OF DAMAGE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-02-20SenateTo Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
2019-02-13SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7054055-710Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback