IL SB1287 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. Excludes principals and assistant principals from joint agreements to share services with other school districts. Specifies what other administrators may be shared. Provides that the joint agreement must contain clear and equitable funding formulas covering each school district's obligations and must be filed with each applicable regional office of education (rather than only the State Board of Education). Requires the State Board of Education to provide technical support as requested by the school districts or the regional office of education. Provides that shared administrator services may not alter an individual school board's authority to make decisions on behalf of a school district. Provides that if, within 6 months after passage of a referendum or adoption of a resolution, the school boards who are parties to the joint agreement are unable to reach an agreement on how they will share the services of a superintendent or other administrator, the regional office of education that has supervision and control of the school districts that are sharing services or, if more than one, the regional office of education that has supervision and control of the largest portion of the affected school districts must assist in the development of the joint agreement. Provides that a petition to enter into or withdraw from a joint agreement must be filed with the school board's secretary (rather than the applicable election authority or, in the case of multiple election authorities, with the State Board of Elections) no more than 92 days (rather than no more 10 months and no less 3 months) prior to the election at which the question is to be submitted to the voters. Makes conforming and other changes.
Title
SCH CD-SUPERINTENDENT AGREEMNT
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Rezin [R] | Sen. Jason Plummer [R] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Rep. Blaine Wilhour [R] |
Rep. Dan Caulkins [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-04-24 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-04-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-04-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 034-004-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Education |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 008-001-001 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Education; 011-001-000 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-21.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |