IL SB1301 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Retail Electric Competition Act of 2006 of the Public Utilities Act. Provides that any information in the report submitted by the Office of Retail Market Development on June 30 of each year involving price comparison between electric utilities, electric utilities providing service outside their service territories, or alternative retail electric suppliers shall also include the combined value of certain additional products and services offered by the competitive retail electricity market. Provides that the Illinois Commerce Commission may include other energy savings and marketing savings programs as they develop in the market.
Title
UTILITY-RETAIL MARKET DEVELOP
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] | Sen. Susan Rezin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Postponed - Energy and Public Utilities |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 20-110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1301&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1301.htm |