IL SB1317 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Title Insurance Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
TITLE INSURANCE ACT-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2021-01-08 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-01-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-01-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-01-08 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 008-005-000 |
2021-01-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-01-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2021-01-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
2021-01-02 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-12-16 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-11-06 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-04-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 047-000-003 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Harmon |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 006-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 008-000-001 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 155 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |