IL SB1321 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-5)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Human Services to promote the availability of the Child Care Assistance Program. Provides that the target audience for the Department's promotion efforts must include all families with children under age 13, families eligible for child care assistance, and child care providers. Requires the Department to adopt any rules necessary to implement the provision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHS-CHILD CARE PROGRAM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
2019-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Human Services; 006-000-000
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Human Services; 006-000-000
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Human Services
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Human Services
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Heather A. Steans
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Heather A. Steans
2019-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 31, 2019
2019-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
2019-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2019-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
2019-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-05-30HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 019-000-000
2019-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 019-000-000
2019-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2019-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2019-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2019-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-05-29HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2019-05-29HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-05-29HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2019-05-29HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Sue Scherer
2019-05-28HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-05-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-05-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2019-05-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2019-05-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2019-05-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2019-05-28SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-05-28SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Heather A. Steans
2019-05-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-14HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2019-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2019-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee; 009-000-000
2019-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-04-24HouseAssigned to Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee
2019-04-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-04-04HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-04HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-04HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-04-04HouseArrived in House
2019-04-04SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019
2019-03-13SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019
2019-03-12SenateDo Pass Human Services; 010-000-000
2019-03-05SenatePostponed - Human Services
2019-02-13SenateAssigned to Human Services
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30559A-11Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1321&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1321.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1321eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1321enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1321ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1321ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB1321_04042019_027000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100SB1321_05302019_003000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB1321ham002_05302019_023001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB1321ham001_05302019_023000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback