IL SB1332 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987 and the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that an oral, written, or sign language statement of an accused made as a result of a custodial interrogation at a police station or other place of detention shall be presumed to be inadmissible as evidence against the accused in any criminal or juvenile court proceeding in which the accused is charged with the commission of an offense that is a homicide or a Class 1 felony or a Class X felony (rather than a homicide offense or a DUI offense in which the DUI was the proximate cause of death) unless: (1) an electronic recording is made of the custodial interrogation; and (2) the recording is substantially accurate and not intentionally altered. Allows the admissibility of a statement given at a time when the interrogators are unaware that the offense could be charged as a homicide or as a Class 1 felony or Class X felony.
Title
JUV CT&CRIM PRO-INTERROGATIONS
Sponsors
Sen. Kwame Raoul [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Re-referred to Assignments; 3-9(b) |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Criminal Law |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2013 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Criminal Law |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2013 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 007-000-002 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 405 | 5-401.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 103-2.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |