IL SB1332 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the School Code's construction.
Title
EDUCATION-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 1-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1332&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB1332.htm |