IL SB1332 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 22 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Comptroller Act. Creates the Illinois Bank On Initiative to increase the use of Certified Financial Products and reduce reliance on alternative financial products. Provides that the Illinois Bank On Initiative shall be administered by the Comptroller, and the Comptroller shall be responsible for specified ongoing activities of the Initiative. Creates the Illinois Bank On Initiative Commission and provides for membership of the Commission. Provides for requirements and duties of the Commission. Requires the Comptroller and the Commission to annually prepare and make available on the Controller's website a report concerning the progress of the Illinois Bank On Initiative. Provides that the Comptroller may adopt rules necessary to implement provisions concerning the Illinois Bank On Initiative and Commission. Defines terms. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ILLINOIS BANK ON INITIATIVE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-05-22SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-22HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2019-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-14HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2019-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy
2019-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2019-05-02HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-01HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2019-04-24HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2019-04-04HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-04HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-04HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-04-04HouseArrived in House
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2019-04-04SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2019-03-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-03-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-03-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-03-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-03-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Castro
2019-03-20SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Financial Institutions; 007-000-000
2019-03-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Financial Institutions
2019-03-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-03-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions
2019-03-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2019-03-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions
2019-03-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-03-12SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-02-22SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-02-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 21, 2019
2019-02-20SenateDo Pass Financial Institutions; 009-000-000
2019-02-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2019-02-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2019-02-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-02-13SenateAssigned to Financial Institutions
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1540523.11New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback