IL SB1344 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0326
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0326
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Identification Card Act and the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that "personally identifying information" includes, among other things, an individual's date of birth, height, weight, hair color, eye color, email address, and registration plate number. Restricts the release of personally identifying information within the Secretary of State's office to employees who have a need to know the information for issuance of driver's licenses, permits, or identification cards and investigation of fraud or misconduct. Provides that the Secretary may release highly restricted personal information only to: (1) officers and employees of the Secretary who have a need to access the information for the issuance of driver's licenses, permits, or identification cards and investigation of fraud or misconduct, (2) law enforcement officials for a criminal or civil law enforcement investigation, (3) the State Board of Elections for the purpose of providing the signature for completion of voter registration, and (4) any other entity the Secretary has authorized by rule. Provides that photos, signatures, and documents proving an applicant's identity for the obtainment of an identification card or driver's license are confidential and shall not be disclosed except to: (i) the individual to whom the card was issued, upon written request, (ii) officers and employees of the Secretary of State who have a need to have access to the stored images for purposes of issuing and controlling driver's licenses, permits, or identification cards and investigation of fraud or misconduct, (iii) law enforcement officials for a civil or criminal law enforcement investigation, and (iv) other entities that the Secretary may exempt by rule. Provides that the Secretary retains the right to require additional verification regarding the validity of a request from law enforcement to access social security information and that, if social security information is disclosed by the Secretary for official purposes, no liability shall rest with the Office of the Secretary of State or any of its officers or employees. Effective immediately.
Title
SOS-PRIVATE INFORMATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0326 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date August 9, 2019 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-10 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-04-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2019 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Sandoval |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 019-000-000 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 017-000-000 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 335 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 335 | 1A | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 1-159.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 2-123 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-110.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-110.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |