IL SB1346 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Revenue Sharing Act. Provides that, if the county treasurer of any county with a population of 3,000,000 or more fails to prepare and mail actual property tax bills for the county, as required under Section 21-30 of the Property Tax Code, by October 1 of any year, beginning in 2011, then that county shall forfeit its share of proceeds from the Local Government Distributive Fund for a 12-month period beginning with the distribution made in January of the next calendar year. Provides that any amounts so forfeited shall be paid instead to the other counties and municipalities within the State in proportion to the number of individual residents of such municipality or county to the total population of the State. Effective immediately.
Title
REV SHARING-FORFEIT PROCEEDS
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-18 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2011-03-03 | Senate | To Executive Subcommittee on State Government Operations; - 3/10/2011 - Postponed - 3/16/2011 - Held |
2011-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Matt Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 115 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1346&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB1346.htm |