IL SB1346 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code, the Airport Authorities Act, the Interstate Airport Authorities Act, the Park District Code, and the County Airports Act. Provides the relevant authority with the power to plan, market, and otherwise support integrated passenger transportation. Defines "integrated passenger transportation". Sets forth requirements for the relevant authority that wishes to apply for federal grants, including that the authority consult with the Secretary of the Department of Transportation, local mass transit districts, if applicable, the Regional Transportation Authority, if applicable, and local municipal planning organizations to ensure the plan is consistent with the Department's published transportation improvement plans for integrated passenger transportation. Effective immediately.
Title
INTEGRATED TRANSPORTATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Re-referred to Assignments; 3-9(b) |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Re-referred to Assignments; 3-9(b) |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 010-004-000 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Postponed - Transportation |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2013 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 016-000-000 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
620 | 50 | 21.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 11-101-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 10 | 4.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1205 | 8-10c | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 5 | 8.16 | New Code | See Bill Text |