IL SB1387 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0329
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0329
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Treasurer Act. Modifies and reorganizes provisions concerning the ABLE account program. Provides that a designated representative under the program includes, among other persons, the account owner's guardian of the person or any other State-appointed guardian. Provides that the State Treasurer may enter into agreements with other states to either allow Illinois residents to participate in a plan operated by another state or to allow residents of other states to participate in the Illinois ABLE plan. Modifies terms under the Act. Amends the Probate Act of 1975. Modifies provisions concerning duties of a guardian of a minor, duties of a personal guardian, and duties of an estate guardian to allow a specified guardian to, without an order of court, open, maintain, and transfer funds to an ABLE account on behalf of the ward and the ward's dependent children as specified under the ABLE account program. Makes conforming and other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
STATE TREASURER-ABLE ACCOUNT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0329 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date August 9, 2019 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2019-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-04-30 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-07 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-03-07 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Financial Institutions; 008-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 505 | 16.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 5 | 11-13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 5 | 11a-17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 5 | 11a-18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |