IL SB1418 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0584
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0584
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Bi-State Development Agency Act. Provides that a county authorized to appoint commissioners that does not contract for light rail service with the Bi-State Development Agency and pay for that service in part with county-generated revenue shall be limited to one commissioner. Provides for appointment of commissioners from counties with a light rail service until a county without light rail service only has one commissioner left.
Title
CHILDREN'S ADVOCACY-INTERVIEW
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 39 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 39 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 39 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-26 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0584 |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 039-020-000 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 039-020-000 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 005-001-000 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 005-001-000 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2, 3 - May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2, 3 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-044-000 |
2019-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. John F. Curran |
2019-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 008-005-000 |
2019-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2019-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-05-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2019-05-15 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 008-005-000 |
2019-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-14 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2019-05-14 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-05-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 6, 2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 140 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 80 | 2.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 80 | 4.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |