IL SB1449 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0332
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0332
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the bill as amended by Senate Amendment 1 with the following changes: Makes changes to the membership of the task force. Provides that the task force shall elect a chairperson from its membership and shall have the authority to determine its meeting schedule, hearing schedule, and agendas. Effective immediately.
Title
INS CD-MENTAL HEALTH PARITY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0332 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date August 9, 2019 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Morrison |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Morrison |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 013-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 013-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Insurance; 016-000-000 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Insurance |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Insurance |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Insurance |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 370c.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |