IL SB1451 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Educator Licensure Article of the School Code. Provides that a Professional Educator License may be issued to a person who holds a valid Educator License with Stipulations with a paraprofessional educator endorsement if he or she (i) has at least 5 years of practical classroom experience, (ii) has worked a minimum of 100 school days in each of those years, (iii) is paired with a mentor teacher for a minimum of one year, who must observe, guide, support, and provide the licensee feedback on his or her performance, as warranted, (iv) commits to participating in a minimum of 24 professional development hours each year, approved by the State Board of Education, or taking postsecondary courses in education geared toward the continuous improvement of his or her professional practice, and (v) has completed an approved alternative educator licensure program.
Title
SCH CD-PROFESSIONL EDU LICENSE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 21B-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1451&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1451.htm |