IL SB1456 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0551
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0551
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that certain leasehold property that is used for an airport, for parking, or for waste disposal or processing and is used for a non-exempt purpose is subject to taxation as a leasehold for the period of time during which it is used for that non-exempt purpose. Provides that the use of a portion of that property for a non-exempt purpose shall have no effect on (i) the exemption of the remaining portion of the property that continues to be used for an exempt purpose or (ii) the future exemption of that same portion of the property if it ceases to be used for a non-exempt purpose and returned to use for an exempt purpose.
Title
PROP TX-NON-EXEMPT PURPOSE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0551 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 057-000-000 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Revenue; 006-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2019-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 015-000-000 |
2019-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-05-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2019-05-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-14 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-03-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 007-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-185 | Amended Code | Citation Text |