IL SB1460 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0333
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0333
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. With regard to the Illinois Teaching Excellence Program, provides that if adequate funds are available, incentives under the Program must include (i) a one-time incentive of $3,000 payable to National Board certified teachers teaching in Tier 1 rural or remote school districts, (ii) an annual incentive of $3,200 for National Board certified teacher rural or remote candidate cohort facilitators, and (iii) an annual incentive of $2,500 for National Board certified teacher rural or remote liaisons; defines terms. Makes the program applicable to qualified educators who are employed by or retired from schools districts (rather than just employed by school districts) and who are in the process of obtaining licensure through the National Board for Professional Teaching Standards. Changes references of poverty or low-performing schools to Tier 1 school districts. Makes other changes.
Title
IL TEACHING EXCELLENCE PROGRAM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0333 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-001-002 |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2019-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 008-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-03-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 048-000-000 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Education; 015-000-000 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 21B-70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |