IL SB1467 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-26 - Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Higher Education Student Assistance Act. Provides that a person is a qualified applicant if, despite not meeting other residency requirements, the applicant is a resident of Illinois at the time of application and at some point after leaving federal active duty service was a resident of Illinois for 15 consecutive years. Effective July 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MIA/POW SCHOLARSHIP-VETS GRANT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-26HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Filed
2019-05-24HouseBalanced Budget Note Filed
2019-05-24HouseHome Rule Note Filed
2019-05-24HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2019-05-23HouseCorrectional Note Filed
2019-05-23HouseJudicial Note Filed
2019-05-23HouseLand Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-23HouseJudicial Note Requested by Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-23HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-23HouseHome Rule Note Requested by Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-23HouseCorrectional Note Requested by Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-23HouseBalanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-23HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-22HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-21HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Higher Education Committee; 009-000-000
2019-05-20HouseState Debt Impact Note Filed
2019-05-20HousePension Note Filed
2019-05-17HouseFiscal Note Filed
2019-05-15HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-15HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-04-11HouseArrived in House
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-04-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Van Pelt
2019-04-10SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 010-000-000
2019-04-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-04-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
2019-04-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-03-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2019
2019-03-27SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateDo Pass as Amended Higher Education; 010-000-000
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
2019-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire
2019-02-20SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2019-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11094740Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback