IL SB1468 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 22 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Veterans' and Military Discount Program Act. Provides that veterans, military personnel, and those spouses and dependents of veterans and military personnel who have been issued valid Military ID or Military Dependent ID cards (rather than only veterans and military personnel) may receive a discount on goods and services from participating merchants, or another appropriate money-saving promotion of a merchant's choice, under the Veterans' and Military Discount Program. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MILITARY DISCOUNT-DEPENDENTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-22SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-22HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nathan D. Reitz
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-14HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2019-05-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 012-000-000
2019-04-09HouseAssigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee
2019-03-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-12HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-03-07HouseArrived in House
2019-03-07SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 7, 2019
2019-03-06SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2019-03-05SenateDo Pass Veterans Affairs; 009-000-000
2019-02-20SenateAssigned to Veterans Affairs
2019-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
33014010Amended CodeCitation Text
3301405Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback