IL SB1472 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Brownfields Redevelopment and Intermodal Promotion Act. Provides that the South Suburban Brownfields Redevelopment Zone also includes Chicago Heights, Sauk Village, Ford Heights, and Country Club Hills. Provides that moneys in the South Suburban Brownfields Redevelopment Fund may also be used for environmental remediation for State surplus property in Worth, Bloom, Rich, Bremen, Thornton, or Orland Township, if and only if an economic development project has been developed and approved by the municipality and the South Suburban Mayors and Managers Association. Provides that moneys in the South Suburban Brownfields Redevelopment Zone Fund shall be held to fund eligible projects through 2026 (currently, 2021).
Title
BROWNFIELDS-COUNTIES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-10 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-04-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2019 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 26, 2019 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Do Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 009-000-000 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 607 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 607 | 3-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |