IL SB1485 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Commission to Study Disproportionate Justice Impact Act. Makes a technical change to a Section concerning the short title.
Title
RACIAL DISCRIMINATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2021-01-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2021-01-09 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-01-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-01-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-01-09 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 005-003-000 |
2021-01-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-01-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee |
2021-01-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-01-02 | House | Assigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-04-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-04-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 048-000-000 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 007-000-000 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 305 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
25 | 170 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
25 | 170 | 4.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 170 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 100 | 5-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 430 | 5-10.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | 5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 430 | 5-70 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | 50-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 430 | 70-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
775 | 5 | 2-108 | New Code | See Bill Text |