IL SB1495 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0553
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0553
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Limited Liability Company Act. Provides that if a company fails to permit the inspection of records as required under the Act, a person making a request or demand may file an action to compel the company to permit the inspection and copying and obtain other legal or equitable relief, including (if the court finds that the company acted unreasonably) costs and attorney's fees. Provides that specified provisions do not limit the personal liability of a member or manager imposed under a law other than the Act, including agency, contract, and tort law. Makes various changes concerning: definitions; admission of members; statements of authority; operating agreements; actions by members; transfer of interests; and dissociation of members.
Title
LLC-INSPECTION OF RECORDS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 77 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 77 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0553 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 006-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Judiciary |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 23, 2019 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 077-040-001 |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-005-000 |
2019-05-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-05-08 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; 005-002-000 |
2019-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-05-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-05-01 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Mulroe |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
805 | 180 | 1-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 180 | 1-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 180 | 10-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 180 | 10-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 180 | 10-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 180 | 13-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 180 | 15-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 180 | 15-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 180 | 30-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 180 | 35-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 180 | 35-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |