IL SB1498 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0554
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0554
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that, subject to appropriation, the State Board of Education must, in consultation with the Board of Higher Education, develop an Agricultural Education Pre-Service Teacher Internship Program, beginning at the secondary education level, for pre-service teaching students that consists of (i) at a minimum, an 8-week experience or 300 hours of experience to prepare the pre-service teaching student for in-classroom experiences, including, but not limited to, experiences in the 5 career clusters for Illinois agricultural education through partnerships with Illinois agricultural companies and (ii) both in-classroom lectures and hands-on, applied learning; defines terms. Provides that the State Board must award grants to a pre-service teaching student enrolled in the Internship Program, which may be used by the student to support (i) a stipend not to exceed $7,500 for a pre-service teaching student's completion of the Internship Program, distributed in monthly installments, (ii) lodging for a pre-service teaching student while participating in the Internship Program, (iii) reimbursement for meals, not to exceed the per diem rate established by the Internal Revenue Service, for a pre-service teaching student while participating in the Internship Program, and (iv) any reasonable costs for participation in the Internship Program charged by any participating Illinois agricultural company. Effective immediately.
Title
AGRICULTURE ED TEACHER PROGRAM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0554 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Effective Date August 23, 2019 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Education; 012-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Education |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 23, 2019 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2019-05-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2019-05-13 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Nathan D. Reitz |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-05-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-05-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-03-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2019-03-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |