IL SB1515 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates a deduction for amounts included in the taxpayer's adjusted gross income for certain fringe benefits. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INC TX-FRINGE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2019-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
2019-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Revenue; 009-000-000
2019-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue
2019-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-05-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 28, 2019
2019-05-27SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-26HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-05-26HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
2019-05-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-09HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 013-000-000
2019-05-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-05-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-05-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-05-01HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-05-01HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-05-01HouseFirst Reading
2019-05-01HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-04-04HouseArrived in House
2019-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2019-04-04SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2019
2019-04-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Hutchinson
2019-04-03SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 007-000-000
2019-03-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2019-03-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-03-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2019
2019-03-13SenateDo Pass as Amended Revenue; 007-000-000
2019-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-03-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-03-06SenatePostponed - Revenue
2019-03-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Revenue
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2019-02-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-02-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-02-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355203Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1515&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1515.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1515eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1515enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1515sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1515sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1515sam003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1515ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB1515_04042019_031000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100SB1515_05262019_018000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB1515ham001_05312019_064000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback