IL SB1524 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Credit Card Marketing Act of 2009. Requires that institutions of higher education that enter into an agreement to market credit cards to students pursuing an education, or that allow their student groups, alumni associations, or affiliates to enter into agreements must make a financial education program available to all students. Contains provisions requiring institutions of higher education to disclose certain agreements with credit card companies. Prohibits certain gifts and inducements. Prohibits the distribution of personally identifiable student information for the purpose of marketing credit cards. Provides that the Attorney General may enforce the Act. Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Includes reports prepared by institutions of higher education documenting their relationships with credit card issuers as a public record. Exempts information about students exempted from disclosure under Sections 10-20.38 or 34-18.29 of the School Code, and information about undergraduate students enrolled at an institution of higher education exempted from disclosure under Section 6 of the Illinois Credit Card Marketing Act of 2009 from the Act. Amends the School Code to provide that a school district, including its agents, employees, student or alumni associations, or any affiliates, may not provide a student's name, address, telephone number, social security number, e-mail address, or other personal identifying information to a business organization or financial institution that issues credit or debit cards. Amends various Acts relating to the governance of public universities in Illinois to prohibit the provision of student information to certain parties. Contains a severability clause.
Title
CREDIT CARD MARKETING ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-08 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-20 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-04-06 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-06 | First Reading | |
2009-04-03 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard | |
2009-04-03 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-03 | Arrived in House | |
2009-04-02 | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 | |
2009-04-02 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter | |
2009-04-02 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi | |
2009-04-02 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2009-04-01 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 2, 2009 | |
2009-03-26 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. M. Maggie Crotty | |
2009-03-25 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-13 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz | |
2009-03-11 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Cronin | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2009 | |
2009-03-11 | Do Pass as Amended Higher Education; 009-000-000 | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2009-03-10 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Edward D. Maloney | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to Higher Education | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-18 | First Reading | |
2009-02-18 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter |