IL SB1524 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 34-9)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 34-9)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Provides that notwithstanding whether the laws of the state or territory where the non-resident resides related to firearm ownership, possession, and carrying, are substantially similar to the requirements to obtain a license under the Act, the Department of State Police shall by rule allow for a non-resident license application if the applicant is an active duty member of the Armed Forces of the United States stationed in this State or the spouse of an active duty member of the Armed Forces of the United States stationed in this State. Provides that the applicant shall pay the resident license or renewal fees (rather than the non-resident fees). Effective immediately.
Title
CONCEALED CARRY FEE-MILITARY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-06-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2017-06-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2017-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2017-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2017-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-05 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2017-05-05 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Weaver |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Reported Back To Judiciary; 003-000-000 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2017-03-01 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Firearms |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 66 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 66 | 60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |