IL SB1525 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0558
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0558
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Requires the Department of Children and Family Services, subject to appropriations, to provide eligible youth an apprenticeship stipend to cover those costs associated with entering an apprenticeship, including, but not limited to fees, tuition for classes, work clothes, rain gear, boots, and occupation-specific tools. Provide that the following youth shall be eligible for an apprenticeship stipend: youth for whom the Department has court-ordered legal responsibility; youth who aged out of care at age 18 or older; or youth formerly under care who have been adopted and were the subject of an adoption assistance agreement or who have been placed in private guardianship and were the subject of a subsidized guardianship agreement. Limits the stipend to eligible youth who: (i) are enrolled in an approved apprenticeship training program; (ii) are not a recipient of any other scholarship or fee waiver provided by the Department; and (iii) are under the age of 26. Provides that apprenticeship stipends shall be available to an eligible youth for a maximum of 5 years after the youth enrolls in a qualifying apprenticeship program. Waives the age requirement and 5-year cap on the stipend for applicants who were unable to enroll in a qualifying apprenticeship program because the applicant: (i) was called into active duty with the United States Armed Forces; (ii) was deployed for service in the United States Public Health Service Commissioned Corps; or (iii) volunteered in the Peace Corps or the AmeriCorps. Requires the Department to develop outreach programs to ensure qualifying youths are aware of the availability of the apprenticeship stipends. Effective January 1, 2020.
Title
DCFS-APPRENTICESHIP STIPENDS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0558 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 058-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Human Services; 008-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Human Services |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 29, 2019 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2019-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2019-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2019-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2019-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2019-05-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2019-05-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-05-15 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2019-05-07 | House | Re-Referred to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-05-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-04-24 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-04 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-04 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-04-04 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 3, 2019 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Peters |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 008-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 010-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 505 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |