IL SB1552 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes: (1) provides that school districts having Personal Property Tax Replacement Fund receipts totaling 13% or more of their total revenues in fiscal year 2018 are entitled to the additional distribution (in the introduced bill, the eligibility of districts is determined each fiscal year); (2) provides that the additional distribution shall be made only in fiscal year 2020 and shall be 19% (in the introduced bill, 11%) of the total amount distributed to the school district from the Personal Property Tax Replacement Fund during fiscal year 2018; and (3) provides that the total amount of additional distributions shall not exceed $4,769,101 (in the introduced bill, $4,353,136). Effective immediately.
Title
REVENUE-SCHOOL DISTRICTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nathan D. Reitz |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-09 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Tracy |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 010-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 015-000-000 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |