IL SB1559 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Tenants Radon Protection Act. Provides that before a lease is signed, a landlord shall provide to each tenant in a dwelling unit any records or reports pertaining to radon concentrations within the dwelling unit that indicate a radon hazard. Provides that if a tenant performs a radon test, the tenant shall provide to the landlord the test result within 10 days after receiving the result. Provides that before a lease is signed a landlord shall furnish each prospective tenant with a prescribed radon hazard disclosure form. Provides that nothing implies an obligation on a landlord or tenant to conduct any radon testing. Provides that a lease may be terminated under specified circumstances involving radon hazards. Provides that this is a limitation on home rule powers. Amends the Illinois Radon Awareness Act. Repeals a provision requiring landlords to give certain disclosures to tenants. Effective January 1, 2020.
Title
TENANT RADON PROTECTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 24, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Public Health; 008-000-003 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |