IL SB1572 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill. Provides that any individual who decides to hold in his or her possession any lost or stray dog of which he or she is not the owner shall, within 48 hours of taking possession of the lost or stray dog shall make every reasonable attempt to contact the owner as soon as possible and relinquish the dog to the owner within a reasonable amount of time after making contact (in the introduced bill, make every reasonable attempt to contact the owner as soon as possible, and return the dog if the owner is found). Changes reference from pedigree to gender. Defines "hold". Makes technical changes.
Title
ANIMAL-STRAY DOG REPORTING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-08 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2019-05-08 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 004-003-000 |
2019-05-07 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-04-25 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-03-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Mulroe |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Agriculture; 009-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Do Pass Agriculture; 011-000-000 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |