IL SB1580 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0405
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0405
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Provides that a non-home rule county with a population of at least 900,000 may adopt an ordinance with reasonable regulations concerning the operation of an adult entertainment facility in unincorporated areas of the county that involves exposure of specified anatomical areas or performance of specified sexual activities by a person within the business' premises or that offers or provides sexually oriented entertainment services or activities. Provides if the county has established a licensing program as part of its regulation of adult entertainment facilities, the findings, decision, and orders of the licensing official or licensing body is subject to review in the Circuit Court of the county and that the Administrative Review Law apply to and govern the judicial review. Allows a code hearing unit of non-home rule counties with a population of at least 900,000 to enforce and prosecute violations of the adult entertainment facilities ordinance through its administrative adjudication program.
Title
COUNTIES-ADULT ENTERTAINMENT
Sponsors
Sen. John Curran [R] | Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] | Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] | Rep. Deanne Mazzochi [R] |
Rep. Terra Costa Howard [D] | Sen. Diane Pappas [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0405 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-003-000 |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 015-000-000 |
2019-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Curran |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 009-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 009-000-000 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-1097.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |