IL SB1581 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Counties Code. Provides that the special county retailers' occupation tax for public safety, public facilities, mental health, substance abuse, or transportation may additionally be imposed for senior citizen programs and social services in the county. Changes the name from the Special County Retailers' Occupation Tax For Public Safety, Public Facilities, Mental Health, Substance Abuse, or Transportation to the Special County Retailers' Occupation Tax. Amends the Transportation Development Partnership Act and the Simplified Sales and Use Tax Administration Act to make conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COUNTY CD-RETAILERS' REVENUE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-05-24HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Mark Batinick
2019-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2019-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-23HouseMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-05-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-002-000
2019-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 015-000-000
2019-04-09HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-03-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-28HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2019-03-28HouseArrived in House
2019-03-28SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateDo Pass as Amended Local Government; 009-000-000
2019-03-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran
2019-03-13SenatePostponed - Local Government
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-03-06SenatePostponed - Local Government
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Local Government
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301775Amended CodeCitation Text
351712Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-1006.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback