IL SB1583 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0406
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0406
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with changes. Provides that an arrest warrant issued for an offender who violated a condition of his or her probation, conditional discharge, or supervision where there is danger of his or her fleeing the jurisdiction or causing serious harm to others or when the offender fails to answer a summons or notice from the clerk of the court or sheriff when the underlying conviction is for the offense of theft, retail theft, or possession of a controlled substance shall remain active for a period not to exceed 10 years from the date the warrant was issued unless a motion to extend the warrant is filed by the office of the State's Attorney or by, or on behalf of, the agency supervising the wanted person (in the introduced bill, an arrest warrant issued for an offender who violated a condition of his or her probation, conditional discharge, or supervision where there is danger of his or her fleeing the jurisdiction or causing serious harm to others or when the offender fails to answer a summons or notice from the clerk of the court or sheriff shall remain active for a period not to exceed 5 years from the date the warrant was issued unless a motion to extend the warrant is filed by the office of the State's Attorney or by, or on behalf of, the agency supervising the wanted person). Provides that the provision is applicable to arrest warrants in Cook County on and after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Deletes language that provides that if a person is serving a sentence of probation, conditional discharge, or supervision for a firearm offense or forcible felony, the warrant shall remain active for a period of 10 years from the date the warrant was issued at which time the wanted person's period of probation, conditional discharge, or supervision shall terminate unsatisfactorily as a matter of law. Effective January 1, 2020.
Title
CD CORR-PROBATION VIOLATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 71 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0406 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Extended Debate - Passed 071-045-000 |
2019-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Extended Debate |
2019-05-23 | House | Removed from Standard Debate Status |
2019-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2019-05-23 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-006-000 |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-14 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-05-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-09 | House | First Reading |
2019-05-09 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 035-015-000 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Collins |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 008-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 008-001-000 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 5-6-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |