IL SB1587 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides for the election of the Chicago Board of Education at the general primary election in 2020 only as a nonpartisan election on a separate ballot. Provides that a member of the Chicago Board of Education shall be elected at each consolidated election thereafter. Makes related changes. Amends the Chicago School District Article of the School Code. Provides that a person shall be a U.S. citizen and registered voter and shall have been a resident of the city and the electoral district for at least one year immediately preceding his or her election. Sets forth provisions concerning nominating petitions and ballots. Sets forth provisions providing that the City of Chicago shall be subdivided into 20 electoral districts by the General Assembly for seats on the Chicago Board of Education. Sets forth provisions providing that in the year following each decennial census, the General Assembly shall redistrict the electoral districts to reflect the results of each decennial census. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
ELECTED CHICAGO SCHOOL BOARD
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 2A-1.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 2A-48 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-13.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-21.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 34-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-4.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 34-4.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1587&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1587.htm |